MA H4373 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Donato of Medford, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Paul J. Donato that the commissioner of Capital Asset Management and Maintenance be authorized to convey certain parcels of land in the city of Medford to North Shore Residential Development, Inc. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to a Medford Residential Development Easement
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-01 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #572 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Yea and Nay No. 515 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Yea and Nay No. 515 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Yea and Nay No. 515 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Yea and Nay No. 515 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 199 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-08-01 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #572 (Yeas 35 to Nays 0) |
2018-07-31 | House | Enacted - 151 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 515) |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Rules supended |
2018-07-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-06-06 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-06-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-06-06 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-05-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/24/2018 from 11:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H1092 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4590
H3892 (Similar To) 2017-10-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
S1148 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H3991 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2017
H3981 (Similar To) 2017-10-31 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H4773 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4848
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3892 (Similar To) 2017-10-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3981
S1148 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H3991 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 128 of the Acts of 2017
H3981 (Similar To) 2017-10-31 - Amendment #1 (Speliotis) adopted
H4773 (Similar To) 2018-07-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4848
H4923 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken