MA H4431 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-21 - Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-21 - Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Aguiar of Fall River and Senator Rodrigues, a joint petition of Kevin Aguiar and Michael J. Rodrigues (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the city of Fall River be authorized to enter into a contract or contracts for the acquisition, purchase, lease, sale, disposition or exchange of certain parcels of real property in regards to a water storage facility at Airport Road in said city. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to a water storage facility in the city of Fall River
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-21 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-11-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-10-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-10-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-10-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-10-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-09-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-09-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4431 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119610&generalCourtId=1 |