MA H4431 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2573
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Text of an amendment, see S2573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Text of an amendment, see S2573
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Text of an amendment, see S2573 |
Same As/Similar To
S2573 (Replaced by) 2022-02-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 23 of the Acts of 2022
S1606 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2573
H2547 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1606 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2573
H2547 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4431 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4431.pdf |