MA H4466 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4586
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4586
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4586
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. DiZoglio of Methuen, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Diana DiZoglio and others that the Department of Public Health be authorized to establish a task force to investigate best practices for alcohol and drug free housing. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Relative to best practices for sober homes
Sponsors
Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D] | Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] | Rep. William Crocker [R] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] |
Rep. Carole Fiola [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4586 |
2018-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2018 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
2018-04-12 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1343 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H875 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S790 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H4586 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H875 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S790 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H4586 (Replaced by) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4466 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4466.pdf |