MA H4484 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Peake of Provincetown and Senator Cyr, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Sarah K. Peake and Julian Cyr that the roundabout at the intersection of state highways routes 28 and 39 in the town of Orleans shall be designated in honor of Dorofei Klimshuk. Transportation. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Designating a certain roundabout in the town of Orleans in honor of Dorofei Klimshuk
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Peake [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-11 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3934 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H874 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H874 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4484 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4484.pdf |