MA H4494 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Pending: House Steering, Policy and Scheduling Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Frost of Auburn, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Paul K. Frost and Ryan C. Fattman that the Worcester County Retirement Board be authorized to credit Curtis Meskus, a member of the Worcester regional retirement system, with creditable service for certain active duty service. Public Service.
Title
Directing the Worcester County Retirement Board to credit Curtis Meskus
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Sen. Ryan Fattman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2023-12-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3979 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
S2399 (Similar To) 2023-10-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4219 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4168 (Similar To) 2023-12-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2023
S2399 (Similar To) 2023-10-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4219 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4168 (Similar To) 2023-12-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4494 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4494.pdf |