MA H4553 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4686
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the examination of evidence rooms and evidentiary procedures. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to the examination of evidence rooms and evidentiary procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Cusack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4686 |
2018-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2018 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2018-05-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H651 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H1214 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1366 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1688 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S374 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H4686 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1214 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S1366 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1688 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S374 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
H4686 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4553 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4553.pdf |