MA H4598 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 24 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 24 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Enacted and laid before the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain municipal employees of the towns of Lee, Lenox or Stockbridge. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to a municipal employee in the town of Lee, the town of Lenox or the town of Stockbridge acting in relation to an intermunicipal agreement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-10-24 | House | Enacted |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-10-03 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-09-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-09-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-09-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-09-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-08-25 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
2016-08-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H930 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1129 (Similar To) 2015-12-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2654 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3063 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1060 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1129 (Similar To) 2015-12-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2654 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3063 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1060 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4598 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4598.pdf |