MA H4603 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4572
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 425 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 425 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting officers in the town of Grafton Police Department from the civil service law.
Title
Exempting officers in the town of Grafton Police Department from the civil service law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 425 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-12-29 | House | Enacted |
2016-12-29 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-12-29 | House | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2016-12-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Moore) adopted |
2016-12-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-11-28 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-11-28 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-10-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-10-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-10-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-09-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-09-08 | House | New draft of H4572 |
2016-09-08 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4572 (Replaces) 2016-09-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4603
S2045 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3839 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2046 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2113 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2158 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2045 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3839 (Similar To) 2016-07-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2046 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2113 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2158 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4603 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4603.pdf |