MA H4664 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4695
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-11 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on October 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-11 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for fiscal year 2016 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Title
Making appropriations for fiscal year 2016 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-10-11 | House | For message, see H4695 |
2016-10-06 | House | Governor returned to the House with veto |
2016-10-06 | Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 283 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-09-30 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Enacted |
2016-09-29 | House | Enacted |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-09-29 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2016-09-29 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Spilka) adopted |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Keenan) rejected |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second |
2016-09-29 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-09-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-09-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-09-29 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-09-29 | House | Reported on a part of H4517 |
2016-09-29 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4695 (Replaced by) 2016-10-11 - See H4664
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4664 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4664.pdf |