MA H4687 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to town meetings of the town of North Reading. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the town meeting of the town of North Reading
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 237 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-08-27 | House | Enacted |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-08-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-07-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-07-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-07-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-07-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-07-02 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H1121 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1136 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H2789 (Similar To) 2017-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2017
S2065 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2017
S2064 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2017
S1136 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H2789 (Similar To) 2017-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2017
S2065 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 36 of the Acts of 2017
S2064 (Similar To) 2017-07-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 35 of the Acts of 2017
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4687 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4687.pdf |