MA H4700 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4928

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 79-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4928
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to emergency paid sick time. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to emergency paid sick time

Sponsors

Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. David Linsky [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]
Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Christine Barber [D]Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Claire Cronin [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Rep. Linda Campbell [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. John Barrett [D]Rep. Roselee Vincent [D]
Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Thomas Walsh [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Mindy Domb [D]Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]
Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Rep. William Pignatelli [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. Marcos Devers [D]Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. Liz Miranda [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Christopher Hendricks [D]Sen. Harriette Chandler [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]
Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Sen. John Velis [D]Rep. James O'Day [D]
Rep. Kate Lipper-Garabedian [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-31HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4928
2020-07-29SenateSenate concurred
2020-07-02HouseReporting date extended to Thursday July 30, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-06-25SenateSenate concurred
2020-06-03HouseReporting date extended to Friday July 3, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-05-22JointHearing scheduled for 05/29/2020 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2020-05-07SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2020-04-27HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

H4928 (Replaced by) 2020-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback