MA H487 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing the gateway city public school driver education program. Education.
Title
Relative to establishing the gateway city public school driver education program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1287 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1511 (Similar To) 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3154 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4540
S1072 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1511 (Similar To) 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3154 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4540
S1072 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H487 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H487.pdf |