MA H4873 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4832
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding a parcel of land in Holyoke
Title
Regarding a parcel of land in Holyoke
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - House - House On Enactment Land Taking Yea and Nay No. 259 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #277 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-31 - Senate - Senate Enacted Roll Call #277 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 137 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #277 (Yeas 39 to Nays 0) |
2020-07-31 | House | Enacted - 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 259) |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-07-28 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-07-22 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-07-22 | House | New draft of H4832 |
2020-07-22 | House | Reported from the committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4832 (Replaces) 2020-07-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4873