MA H600 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to be known as the promise commission to conduct an ongoing study of all matters concerning education in the 21st century. Education.
Title
Fulfilling the promise of education reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 02:00 PM-08:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S267 (Similar To) 2024-02-29 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H600 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H600.pdf |