MA H641 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2235
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2235
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the higher education endowment match program. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to the endowment match program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-14 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2235 |
2017-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S690 (Similar To) 2017-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2235
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2235 (Replaced by) 2017-12-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2235 (Replaced by) 2017-12-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H641 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H641.pdf |