MA H676 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the disclosure of donations by major policy makers engaging in political activity. Election Laws.
Title
Requiring major policy makers to disclose donations to entities engaging in political activity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/17/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S161 (Similar To) 2023-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2707 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1016 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
H2707 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1016 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H676 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H676.pdf |