MA H709 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Election Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing disclosure of political phone calls and further regulating push polling, so-called. Election Laws.
Title
Providing disclosure of political phone calls
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H1433 (Similar To) 2023-11-15 - Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H709 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H709.pdf |