MA H735 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for a school emergency preparedness instructional awareness program. Emergency Preparedness and Management.
Title
Relative to an emergency preparedness instructional awareness program
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Frost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/12/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Emergency Preparedness and Management |
Same As/Similar To
S42 (Similar To) 2024-01-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2570
S2570 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4375 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4493 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2570 (Similar To) 2024-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4375 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Adopted, in concurrence
H4493 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Adopted, in concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H735 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H735.pdf |