MA H747 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate reimbursements for educational assistance to certain municipalities under the room occupancy excise tax. Revenue.
Title
Regulating reimbursements for educational assistance to certain municipalities under the room occupancy excise tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4503 |
2011-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2011 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred. |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Revenue. |
2011-01-10 | House | Bill Filed. |
Same As/Similar To
H4503 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H747 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8477&generalCourtId=1 |