MA H756 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Dooley of Norfolk, a petition of Shawn Dooley and Michael J. Soter that the Secretary of Energy and Environmental Affairs be directed to perform a study of Kingsbury Pond in the town of Norfolk. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To establish a study of Kingsbury Pond in the town of Norfolk
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H2085 (Similar To) 2019-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2238 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1789 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3001 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H1787 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3741
H3915 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4920
H4090 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2019
H2238 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1789 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3001 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
H1787 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3741
H3915 (Similar To) 2020-07-30 - New draft substituted, see H4920
H4090 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 129 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H756 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H756.pdf |