MA H79 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for net neutrality and consumer protection. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
Relative to providing for net neutrality and consumer protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-07-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
S2478 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4571 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Adopted
H4571 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H79 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H79.pdf |