MA H796 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for residency in the existing house within the Manuel F. Correllus State Forest. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
To provide for housing within the Manuel F. Correllus State Forest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H4094 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4234 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4553 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted
S2744 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - House concurred
H4234 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4553 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Adopted
S2744 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H796 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H796.pdf |