MA H852 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4555
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of a water infrastructure improvement fund to provide assistance to cities and towns for clean water and economic development. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
Relative to municipal assistance for clean water and economic development infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4555 |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S1321 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
S1686 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
H4555 (Replaced by) 2024-04-16 - Reported, in part, by H868
S1686 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
H4555 (Replaced by) 2024-04-16 - Reported, in part, by H868
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H852 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H852.pdf |