MA H865 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5030
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5030
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5030
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the maintenance of certain footpaths and trails at the Blue Hills Reservation and the Neponset Reservation. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Making an appropriation for the fiscal year 2020 to provide for funding of certain footpaths and trails
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5030 |
2019-09-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H757 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4021 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2019
H5030 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4021 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 84 of the Acts of 2019
H5030 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H865 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H865.pdf |