MA H880 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to emerging contaminants on public water systems. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
To improve the review and regulation of emerging contaminants on public water systems
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Philips [D] | Rep. Vanna Howard [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Simon Cataldo [D] |
Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] | Sen. Nick Collins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S460 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
H827 (Similar To) 2023-09-14 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H827 (Similar To) 2023-09-14 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/27/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H880 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H880.pdf |