MA H888 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to residential solid waste disposal and the implementation of mandatory reporting standards for cities and towns. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
To incentivize the reduction of residential waste disposal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S1321 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2647
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H888 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H888.pdf |