MA H924 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-28 - Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to non-residents operating snowmobiles during a free snowmobile weekend. Environment and Natural Resources.
Title
To establish a free snowmobile weekend
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
S528 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2649
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H924 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H924.pdf |