MA H936 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing continuity of care for mental health treatment insurance coverage. Financial Services.
Title
Providing continuity of care for mental health treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S657 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H4581 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Adopted
H4581 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H936 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H936.pdf |