MA S1050 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to create reparations for the descendants of American slavery and piloting universal basic income. The Judiciary.
Title
Creating reparations for the descendants of American slavery and piloting universal basic income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday April 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1053 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1050 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1050.pdf |