MA S1125 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2638
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to social consumption of marijuana. Cannabis Policy.
Title
Relative to social consumption of marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-21 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2638 |
2019-07-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Cannabis Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H2398 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2400 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S521 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2596 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3541 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4524
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S976 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
S2638 (Replaced by) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2400 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S521 (Similar To) 2020-03-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1759 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Accompanied H2517
H2570 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2596 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H2495 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H3541 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4524
H3516 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S976 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3899 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Resolutions adopted
S2638 (Replaced by) 2020-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1125 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1125.pdf |