MA S1164 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Labor and Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect warehouse workers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Protecting warehouse workers
Sponsors
Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
Sen. Michael Moore [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S188 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2630
S1837 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H1878 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
S1837 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H1878 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1164 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1164.pdf |