MA S123 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide consumers with equal protection for all real estate appraisals. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Providing consumers with equal protection for all real estate appraisals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H2956 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1423 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2133 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2091 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1424 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H3032 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2286 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2354
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2354 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2019
S2353 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2020
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3036 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied H3141
H3017 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3069 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1423 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H2133 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2091 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2108 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2558
S2065 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3044 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
H332 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1434 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
S1424 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2565
H3032 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
S2262 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2353
S2286 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2354
S2333 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
S2354 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 96 of the Acts of 2019
S2353 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 14 of the Acts of 2020
H3137 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3036 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied H3141
H3017 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
S2409 (Similar To) 2019-11-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S123 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S123.pdf |