MA S1240 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-10-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to an increase of fines and penalties for violations of laws relating to fire explosions and fire prevention. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to an increase of fines and penalties for violations of laws relating to fire, explosions and fire prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-20 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2011-10-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/11/2011 from 12:00 AM-05:00 AM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1240 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10948&generalCourtId=1 |