MA S1252 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1967
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to consistent care for addiction rooted in evidence. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.
Title
Regarding consistent care for addiction rooted in evidence
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] | Rep. Ruth Balser [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Accompanied by H1967 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-10-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-10-26 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-10-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
Same As/Similar To
S1435 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2648
H1967 (Replaces) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied S1252
H1967 (Replaces) 2024-04-18 - Accompanied S1252
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1252 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1252.pdf |