MA S1300 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2362
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require payment by certain prisoners of the Commonwealth. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Requiring payment by certain prisoners of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] | Rep. Leonard Mirra [R] | Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] |
Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-23 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2362 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S2362 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1230 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1173 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S964 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S65 (Similar To) 2016-01-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S386 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
S489 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1555 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
H2250 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
S1230 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1173 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S964 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
S65 (Similar To) 2016-01-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S386 (Similar To) 2016-07-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4484
S489 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1555 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
H2250 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1300 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1300.pdf |