MA S148 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect reproductive health access, LGBTQ lives, religious liberty, and freedom of movement by banning the sale of cell phone location information. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Protecting reproductive health access, LGBTQ lives, religious liberty, and freedom of movement by banning the sale of cell phone location information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S1228 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2633
S1022 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4323
S27 (Similar To) 2023-07-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H83 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H357 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
S1022 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4323
S27 (Similar To) 2023-07-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H83 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H357 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S148 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S148.pdf |