MA S1539 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require health care employers to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Requiring health care employers to develop and implement programs to prevent workplace violence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | House concurred |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday April 8, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2330 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1539 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1539.pdf |