MA S1583 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-30 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-07-30 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the leasing of the Leo J. Martin memorial golf course. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the leasing of the Leo j. Martin Memorial golf course.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-30 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-07-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2012-03-12 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Bonding, Capital Expenditure and State Assets |
2012-04-03 | Senate | Hearing scheduled for 04/05/2012 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1 |
2011-03-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2011 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred. |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1583 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10078&generalCourtId=1 |