MA S1602 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2678
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Massachusetts fund for vulnerable countries most affected by climate change. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts fund for vulnerable countries most affected by climate change
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Barrett [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] |
Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2678 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S433 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H749 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S1663 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1924 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1987 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3846 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3941
H3987 (Similar To) 2019-07-24 - Published as amended, see H3997
H3997 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S2678 (Replaced by) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H749 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S1663 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1924 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1987 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H3846 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3941
H3987 (Similar To) 2019-07-24 - Published as amended, see H3997
H3997 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Hearing scheduled for 02/25/2020 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S2678 (Replaced by) 2020-05-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1602 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1602.pdf |