MA S1638 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide fair and affordable public retiree benefits. Public Service.
Title
To provide fair and affordable public retiree benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1638 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1638.pdf |