MA S1654 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Charlton to remove police department positions from civil service. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Charlton to remove police department positions from civil service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | House concurred |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4071 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4122 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H4212 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4122 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Senate concurred
H4212 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1654 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1654.pdf |