MA S1702 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to teacher retirement election. Public Service.
Title
Relative to teacher retirement election
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4071 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4076 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4175 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4212 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4507 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4076 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4175 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4212 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4507 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1702 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1702.pdf |