MA S1784 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to estate tax reform. Revenue.
Title
Relative to estate tax reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2832 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Senate concurred
H3667 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2965 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H3906 (Similar To) 2023-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2023
H4458 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H3667 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2965 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
H3906 (Similar To) 2023-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2023
H4458 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Hearing scheduled for 04/19/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1784 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1784.pdf |