MA S1796 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to close the single sales factor tax loophole. Revenue.
Title
Closing the single sales factor tax loophole
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1835 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
H4524 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4478 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4524 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence
H4478 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1796 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1796.pdf |