MA S1822 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to advance renewable heating solutions for the Commonwealth. Revenue.
Title
Advancing renewable heating solutions for the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-05-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2129 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2719
H3148 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
H2938 (Similar To) 2023-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2529 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2558 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
H3148 (Similar To) 2024-04-08 - Reporting date extended to Thursday June 20, 2024, pending concurrence
H2938 (Similar To) 2023-11-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2529 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2558 (Similar To) 2024-04-03 - House concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1822 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1822.pdf |