MA S1823 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand the child tax credit. Revenue.
Title
Expanding the child tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | House | House concurred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1903 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1913 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1792 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S1814 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2736 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1913 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1792 (Similar To) 2023-03-23 - Hearing scheduled for 03/28/2023 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-1
S1814 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
H2736 (Similar To) 2023-11-08 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1823 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S1823.pdf |