MA S1845 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5247
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to senior citizen property tax credits. Revenue.
Title
Relative to senior citizen property tax credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5247 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3901 (Similar To) 2022-10-19 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 241 of the Acts of 2022
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3734 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Amendment #1 (Garlick) adopted
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
H2934 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3055 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1800 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1885 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5019 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2022
H5247 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1937 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H4175 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3766 (Similar To) 2022-07-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 100 of the Acts of 2022
H3767 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 390 of the Acts of 2022
H3734 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Amendment #1 (Garlick) adopted
H3989 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 225 of the Acts of 2022
S2512 (Similar To) 2022-09-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 210 of the Acts of 2022
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H4107 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
H3731 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2022
H2934 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2921 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2983 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3055 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1800 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1885 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5019 (Similar To) 2022-08-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 190 of the Acts of 2022
H5247 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1937 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
H4175 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1845 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1845.pdf |