MA S1848 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate the “Giant Puffball” fungus as the official mushroom of the Commonwealth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating the “Giant Puffball” fungus as the official mushroom of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-04 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H790 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3946
H3946 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3946 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1848 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1848.pdf |