MA S1923 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - New draft substituted, see S2476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - New draft substituted, see S2476
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to advance electric vehicle adoption. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
To advance electric vehicle adoption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2476 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read second |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 30, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2476 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Accompanied by S1927 |
2019-08-05 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2875 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H2923 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1927 (Replaces) 2020-01-23 - Accompanied S1923
S2476 (Replaced by) 2020-01-30 - Reprinted as amended, see S2498
S1925 (Replaced by) 2020-02-11 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
H2923 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1927 (Replaces) 2020-01-23 - Accompanied S1923
S2476 (Replaced by) 2020-01-30 - Reprinted as amended, see S2498
S1925 (Replaced by) 2020-02-11 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted, as amended
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1923 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S1923.pdf |